Alberico GAMBINO
Constituencies
- FRATELLI D' ITALIA Italy 2024/07/16 -
Groups
- ECR Member European Conservatives and Reformists Group 2024/07/16 -
Committees
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Substitute of | Committee on Transport and Tourism | 2024/07/19 | |
Vice-Chair of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2024/07/23 | |
Vice-Chair of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2024/07/23 |
Show earlier committees...
Role | Committee | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Committee on Foreign Affairs | 2024/07/19 | 2024/07/22 |
Member of | Subcommittee on Security and Defence | 2024/07/19 | 2024/07/22 |
Delegations
Role | Delegation | Start | End |
---|---|---|---|
Member of | Delegation for relations with Central Asia | 2024/09/19 | |
Substitute of | Delegation to the Euronest Parliamentary Assembly | 2024/09/19 |
Contact
- [javascript protected email address]
Brussels
- Phone: 003222845562
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. SOPHIE SCHOLL 03U037
- Full Address
- City: Bruxelles/Brussel
- Zip: B-1047
- Street: 60, rue Wiertz / Wiertzstraat 60
Strasbourg
- Phone: 0033388175562
- Fax:
- Office: Bât. WINSTON CHURCHILL M05084
- Full Address
- City: Strasbourg
- Zip: CS 91024 - F-67070
- Street: 1, avenue du Président Robert Schuman
Activities
Stats
Amendment Co-authors
Name | Group | Country | Ams |
---|---|---|---|
Adam BIELAN | ECR | Poland | 1 |
Rihards KOLS | ECR | Latvia | 1 |
Cristian TERHEŞ | ECR | Romania | 1 |
Sebastian TYNKKYNEN | ECR | Finland | 1 |
Carlo FIDANZA | ECR | Italy | 1 |
Bert-Jan RUISSEN | ECR | Netherlands | 1 |
Assita KANKO | ECR | Belgium | 1 |
By types
Amendments (1)Institutional motions (7)
Plenary speeches (2)
Written questions (6)
By dossiers
Count | Dossier Reference | Title |
1 | 2024/0176(BUD) | 2025 general budget: all sections |
1 | 2024/2804(RSP) | |
1 | 2024/2805(RSP) | |
1 | 2024/2803(RSP) |
See historical changes of the Bio
Born
1967/12/07 - PAGANIAlberico GAMBINO on
History
(these mark the time of scraping, not the official date of the change)
2024-09-20Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Delegations |
|
2024-09-11Show (3) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
Piero Antonio PEPE
|
assistants/local/0 |
Ione ABBATANGELO
|
assistants/service providers |
|
2024-09-08Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/3 |
Maurizio MOSCHETTI
|
2024-09-06Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/3 |
Maria SILVESTRI
|
2024-09-05Show (2) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local/0 |
Italo Giuseppe CIRIELLI DE MOLA
|
assistants/local/2 |
Domenico FORINO
|
2024-09-04Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/accredited/0 |
Assuntina PETRAGLIA
|
2024-08-31Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/local |
|
2024-08-02Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
assistants/paying agents |
|
2024-07-25Show (6) Changes | Timetravel
Committees/0/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2024-07-22T00:00:00 |
Committees/1 |
|
Committees/1/end |
Old
9999-12-31T00:00:00New
2024-07-22T00:00:00 |
Committees/2 |
|
Committees/3 |
|
Committees/4 |
|
2024-07-24Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Gender |
M
|
2024-07-24Show (1) Changes | Timetravel
Declaration on awareness of conflicts of interest/0 |
|
2024-07-23Show (1) Changes
Declaration on awareness of conflicts of interest |
|